Bryanton, Mark Houston (CPSO#: 93380)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bryanton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2018