Brzezinski, Jack Joshua (CPSO#: 90769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK JOSHUA BRZEZINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRZEZINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013