Bubbar, Vikrant Kumar (CPSO#: 81627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2009