Buchanan, Ian Mitchell (CPSO#: 95889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Brown University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13th Floor
119 King Street West
c/o Regional Supervising Coroner
Hamilton ON  L8P 4Y7
Canada
Phone: 9055468200
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Buchanan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Buchanan ( CPSO# 95889 )

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare-Hamilton
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 17, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ian Mitchell Buchanan in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Buchanan has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. IAN MITCHELL BUCHANAN
                                           ("Dr. Buchanan")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Buchanan, certificate of registration number 95889, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that the College investigated a complaint
                  bearing File Number 107802 (the "Investigation") regarding my emergency
                  medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every other month, for a total
                              of three (3) visits, in addition to the initial visit;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, including a minimum of ten (10) charts with a
                              Canadian Triage Acuity Scale (CTAS) score of 1, 2 and 3;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record keeping; 
                        (ii)  a review and written summary of College Policy #4-12: Medical
                              Records; and
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to complete the medical record keeping
                        course and any professional education recommended by my Clinical
                        Supervisor by the end of the period of Clinical Supervision or, if
                        no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter. I further undertake to submit the
                        written summary of the Medical Records policy to the College within
                        two (2) months of signing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Buchanan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Buchanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College investigated a complaint regarding Dr. Buchanan
                        emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Buchanan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Buchanan will engage in professional education in medical
                              record keeping.
                  
                              Dr. Buchanan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Buchanan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

           (16)  I, Dr. Buchanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                 the following information to any person who requires this information for
                 the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                 and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                 (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                       entering into this Undertaking;
                 
                 (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                       of, my practice; and 
                 
                 (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                       this Undertaking.
                 
           (17)  I, Dr. Buchanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                 all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                 circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                 arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

           (18)  I, Dr. Buchanan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                 facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                 Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                 College, and to one another, any of the following:

                 (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                 
                 (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                       Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                       Undertaking;
                 
                 (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                 
                 (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                       compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                 
                 (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                       providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                       believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ian Mitchell Buchanan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 17, 2018:

The College investigated a complaint regarding Dr. Buchanan emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Buchanan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Buchanan will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Buchanan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.