Buckle, Christopher Eric (CPSO#: 96932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: (416) 763-2875
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V1R8
Canada
Phone: 4164340498
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Medicine Hat Regional Hospital
666 5th ST SW
Medicine Hat AB  T1A4H6
Canada
Phone: 4035298000
County: 
Electoral District: 

101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Canada
Phone: 9058954521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9058831212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Buckle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Buckle ( CPSO# 96932 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-3377

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  L3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
Medicine Hat Regional Hospital
666 5th Street SW
Medicine Hat AB  T1A 4H6
Phone Number: (403) 529-8000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ERIC BUCKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012