Bucur, Mirela Silvia Maria (CPSO#: 78734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Special Services Unit
HPHA - Stratford General Hospital
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 272-8249
Fax: (519) 272-8226
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mirela Bucur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bucur ( CPSO# 78734 )

Business Address:
Special Services Unit
HPHA - Stratford General Hospital
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone Number: (519) 272-8249

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRELA SILVIA MARIA BUCUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011