Bueno Patino, Mario (CPSO#: 85218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Canada
Phone: (519) 235-3343
Fax: (519) 235-3845
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bueno-Patino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bueno Patino ( CPSO# 85218 )

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO BUENO PATINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUENO PATINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2018 to 18 Nov 2018
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008