Buffo Sequeira, Ilan (CPSO#: 78424)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Escuela De Medicina Universidad Anahuac, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2009