Bui, Luke Long Quoc (CPSO#: 76406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10023 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T7
Phone: (905) 918-0243
Fax: (905) 918-0391
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

390 Steeles Ave W.
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 882-6566
Fax: (905) 882-6567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke L. Bui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bui ( CPSO# 76406 )

Business Address:
Suite 11
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 882-6566

Business Address:
10023 Yonge Street
Lower Level
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T7
Phone Number: (905) 918-0243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE LONG QUOC BUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006