Bujak, Matthew Camil (CPSO#: 81453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 812
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 551-6325
Fax: 647-341-6322
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carrot Eye Surgery Clinic
Unit 2
Building A
800 Southdown Road
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4
Canada
Phone: (905) 822-2020
Fax: (905) 822-3030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2238 Dundas St West
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Canada
Phone: (417) 760-8777
Fax: (416) 760-0748
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bujak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bujak ( CPSO# 81453 )

Business Address:
Suite 812
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 551-6325

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6118

Business Address:
308 - 2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 760-8777

Business Address:
Carrot Eye Surgery Clinic
2 - 800 Southdown Road
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4
Phone Number: (905) 822-2020

Business Address:
61 Queen Street East
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW CAMIL BUJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUJAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2011