Bulley, Sean Robert (CPSO#: 71598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 21 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN ROBERT BULLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2001