Bullock, Richard Wayne (CPSO#: 53849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH Cardiogy
2075 Hadwen Rd.
Mississauga, ON
L5K 2L3
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone: 905-855-1860
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.W. Bullock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bullock ( CPSO# 53849 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 17, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 17, 2017, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College that effective June 2017, Dr. Richard Bullock has agreed not to exercise his emergency room privileges at Hamilton Health Sciences during the course of an investigation by Hamilton Health Sciences into Dr. Bullock’s professional activities.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WAYNE BULLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1985