Buongiorno, Pinella (CPSO#: 95852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Platinum Medical Clinic
3170 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: 416-265-6737
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caroline Family Health Team
3305 Harvester Rd
Units 15-20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: 905-632-0375
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Lakeshore Lodge
3197 Lakeshore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON  M8V 3X5
Canada
Phone: 416-392-9440
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pinella Buongiorno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Buongiorno ( CPSO# 95852 )

Business Address:
Unit 15-20
3305 Harvestor Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (647) 982-7104

Business Address:
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Phone Number: (647) 982-7104

Business Address:
66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (647) 982-7104

Business Address:
3197 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 3X5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PINELLA BUONGIORNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUONGIORNO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013