Burdett, Rachel L (CPSO#: 77819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street W.
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 800-5533
Fax: (519) 800-5536
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Region Hospital - Ouellette
Jeanne Marce Building
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 33354
Fax: (519) 973-0210
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel L. Burdett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Burdett ( CPSO# 77819 )

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 800-5533

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL L BURDETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURDETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2005 to 09 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007