Burgess, Stephen Michael (CPSO#: 89155)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2011