Burgess, Thomas Scott Taro (CPSO#: 102200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Hospice
34 Wellington St. E
Chatham ON  N7M 3N7
Phone: (519) 354-3113
Fax: 519-436-9982
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6038 Empress St.
Windsor ON  N8T 1B5
Canada
Phone: 519-974-7100
Fax: 5199747672
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Burgess Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Burgess ( CPSO# 102200)

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Hospice
34 Wellington Street East
Chatham ON  N7M 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 354-3113

Business Address:
6038 Empress Street
Windsor ON  N8T 1B5
Phone Number: (519) 974-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS SCOTT TARO BURGESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2016