Burke, Andrew Michael (CPSO#: 91383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Renal Clinic
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: 519 822 7664
Fax: 519 822 0701
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 11 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW MICHAEL BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2014 to 27 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2014