Burke, Clarissa Ann (CPSO#: 88343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: Holding, Clarissa Ann (used until: 18 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
143 Metcalfe St, 2nd Floor
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: 2263690264
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clarissa Burke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Burke ( CPSO# 88343 )

Business Address:
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Business Address:
2nd Floor
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (226) 369-0264

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARISSA ANN BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010