Burkett, Andrew Michael (CPSO#: 91873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardio Pulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW MICHAEL BURKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 15 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013