Burkett, Anna Christine (CPSO#: 95804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: Chaplin, Anna Christine (used until: 05 Apr 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Unit 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA CHRISTINE BURKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2016