Burneo de las Casas, Jorge Guillermo (CPSO#: 80599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Feb 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Division of Neurology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3464 Ext. 13431
Fax: (519) 663-3498
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burneo de las Casas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Burneo de las Casas ( CPSO# 80599 )

Business Address:
Division of Neurology
LHSC - University Campus
Suite B10 - 120
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3464

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Peru

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 05 Feb 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Apr 2004 to 04 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Jorge   Guillermo   Burneo  de  las  Casas  may  practise  medicine
            independently in Neurology, 
                  only.