Bursey, Tiffany Elizabeth (CPSO#: 95683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton McMaster Family Health Centr
1221 Lakeshore Rd Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Burlington Medical Centre
1960 Appleby line suite 18
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: 9053192000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Maple Villa Long Term Care
441 Maple Ave, Burlington
Burlington ON  L7S 1L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 639-2264
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Bursey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bursey ( CPSO# 95683 )

Business Address:
Halton McMaster Family Health Centre
1221 Lakeshore Road
Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Business Address:
1245 Laskeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
18 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7B 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIFFANY ELIZABETH BURSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2013