Burstein, Jason Mitchell (CPSO#: 72366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. M. Burstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Burstein ( CPSO# 72366 )

Business Address:
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
E5 - 235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MITCHELL BURSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002