Bursztyn, Lulu Liane Catherine Danielle (CPSO#: 91146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6214
Fax: 5196466129
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6214
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lulu Bursztyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bursztyn ( CPSO# 91146 )

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6214

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LULU LIANE CATHERINE DANIELLE BURSZTYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURSZTYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015