Bush, Shirley Harvey (CPSO#: 90373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Apr 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Division of Palliative Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 1060
Fax: (613) 562-6371
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Palliative Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Shirley Harvey Bush may practise medicine independently in palliative
                  medicine.