Bustani, Laith Aasim (CPSO#: 79583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: Baumgartner, Mark Jason (used until: 08 Mar 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Forrest Hill Nursing Home
6501 Campeau Dr
Kanata ON  K2K 3E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 599-1991 Ext. 13
Fax: (613) 599-9096
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laith Bustani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bustani ( CPSO# 79583 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
6501 Campeau Drive
Ottawa ON  K2K 3E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAITH AASIM BUSTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSTANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005