Butan, Radu (CPSO#: 79759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, ON
K9J7C6
Room W2603
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V2
Phone: 7058765147
Fax: 7058765178
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017


Corporation Name: Butan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Butan ( CPSO# 79759 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5078

Business Address:
815 High Street East
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 876-8737

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7735

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADU BUTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007