Butty, Ziad (CPSO#: 96216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 640-0661
Fax: (416) 640-0664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Toronto Eye Care
Dundas Medical Building , Unit #308
2238 Dundas St W
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 760-8777
Fax: (416) 760-0748
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Clearview Vision Institute
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 289-4000
Fax: (416) 289-2318
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Butty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Butty ( CPSO# 96216 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 289-2318

Business Address:
One Medical Place
Suite 310
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 640-0661

Business Address:
West Toronto Eye Care
Dundas Medical Building
Unit 308
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 760-0748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIAD BUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017