Byrne, Adam Kenneth Joseph (CPSO#: 95186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 Centrum Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 837-5454
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
401 Smyth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 613-737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 04 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM KENNETH JOSEPH BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016