Byrne, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 83805)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2005 to 20 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2005 to 23 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2005