Dey, Chris (CPSO#: 94397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2363
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Dey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Chris Dey may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.