Steyn, Chris (CPSO#: 83890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MSK Centre
Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0607
Fax: (519) 603-0608
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
Dept of Orthopaedic Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L2X2
Canada
Phone: 9055212100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Grand River hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E8
Canada
Phone: 519 749 4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steyn ( CPSO# 83420 )
Dr. C. Steyn ( CPSO# 83890 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
MSK Centre
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0662

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 603-0662

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Manitoba
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS STEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005