First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |