Cabrera Abreu, Casimiro Jose (CPSO#: 94420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2010

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De La Laguna, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Mood Disorders Service
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: 613 544 4900
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casimiro Cabrera Abreu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cabrera Abreu ( CPSO# 94420 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Mental Health Services Site
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567


Corporation Name: Vazquez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vazquez ( CPSO# 110614)
Dr. C. Cabrera Abreu ( CPSO# 94420 )

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7M 2G4
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567

Business Address:
Kingston General Hosptial
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Casimiro Jose Cabrera Abreu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. Cabrera-Abreu holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and 
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Cabrera
                  Abreu no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This certificate is issued on September 14, 2010, and expires on June 30,
                  2023.   Upon renewal of  Dr.  Cabrera  Abreu's  academic  appointment  at
                  Queen's University,  the  expiry  date  can  be  extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.