Caco, Christopher Carl (CPSO#: 32915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson St
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-9744
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite B118
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 6553
Fax: 416-469-6554
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CARL CACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1986