Cagiannos, Catherine (CPSO#: 64979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus A280
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
K1Y4E9
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16268
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky
USA - Ohio
USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE CAGIANNOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAGIANNOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993