Caissie, Mathieu (CPSO#: 91648)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2011