Caissie, Sylvie (CPSO#: 93542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ottawa medical group
Suite 2
4289 innes rd
Orleans ON  K1E0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvie Caissie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Caissie ( CPSO# 93542 )

Business Address:
Asclepios Medical Clinic
Suite 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
2 - 4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0P8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1911

Business Address:
713 Che Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0Z2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIE CAISSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAISSIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2014