Cakarevic, Svetlana (CPSO#: 85810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apple Tree Medical Centre
2575B Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 726-3560
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

455 McNeely Ave
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 253-2233
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cakarevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cakarevic ( CPSO# 85810 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
2575B Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Arnprior & District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
455 McNeely Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4S6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 22, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 22, 2017, Queensway Carleton Hospital (QCH) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act, that in August 2017, Dr. Cakarevic resigned her privileges at QCH during the course of an investigation by QCH into her practice at QCH.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA CAKAREVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAKAREVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009