Caldwell, Chalmers Wingate (CPSO#: 31507)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003