Callaghan, Maximilian Wilfred (CPSO#: 77788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 CF Health Services Centre
CFB Kingston
P O Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 5508
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Canada
Phone: 613-766-0318
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maximilian Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Callaghan ( CPSO# 77788 )

Business Address:
CFB Kingston
33 CF Health Services Centre
PO Box 17000
26 Somme Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone Number: (613) 541-5010

Business Address:
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A9
Phone Number: (613) 766-0318

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAXIMILIAN WILFRED CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005