Callan, Nicole Lorraine (CPSO#: 82655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite 414
Oakville, Ontario
L6M 1M1
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: 289-863-7404
Fax: 289-863-7405
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole Callan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Callan ( CPSO# 82655 )

Business Address:
414 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 863-7404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE LORRAINE CALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010