Calton, Rajneesh Kumar (CPSO#: 81894)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University India, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008