Calvert, Lynn Carmen (CPSO#: 71597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9630
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Calvert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Calvert ( CPSO# 71597 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9620


Corporation Name: Calvert Meneses Gartner Moghaddam-Abrishami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moghaddam-Abrishami ( CPSO# 83521 )
Dr. L. Calvert ( CPSO# 71597 )
Dr. M. Meneses Gartner ( CPSO# 96201 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
4125 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4X5

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9630

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN CARMEN CALVERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALVERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1999