Campbell, Clinton James Vaughan (CPSO#: 105646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Laboratory Medicine Program 11th Fl
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLINTON JAMES VAUGHAN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 May 2015 to 31 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2018