Campbell, Douglas Mark (CPSO#: 71521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 6560
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6925
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Campbell ( CPSO# 71521 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 Bond Street
Suite 15014
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6925

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS MARK CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001