Campbell, Gregory John (CPSO#: 91449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6497 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd North
Orleans, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 841-8500
Fax: (613) 841-5310
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orleans Urgent Care Centre
1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans
Ottawa ON  K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: (613) 841-5389
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory J. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Campbell ( CPSO# 91449 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Box 930
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8132

Business Address:
6479 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard North
Orleans ON  K1C 2R1
Phone Number: (613) 841-8500

Business Address:
100 - 1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5389

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011