Campeau, Denise Lynne (CPSO#: 68241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Names: Parkinson, Denise Lynne (used until: 26 Sep 1999 )     Campeau, Denise Lynne (used until: 15 Oct 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 15
235 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5
Phone: (905) 397-7716
Fax: (905) 397-7028
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Campeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Campeau ( CPSO# 68241 )

Business Address:
235 Martindale Road
Unit 16
Grimsby ON  L2W 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 397-7716

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE LYNNE CAMPEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996