Campisi, Paolo (CPSO#: 78214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6558
Fax: (416) 813-5036
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paolo Campisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Campisi ( CPSO# 78214 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAOLO CAMPISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPISI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Research Fellows - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002