Candia, Pascual Remberto (CPSO#: 85512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
2079 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1E2
Phone: (905) 634-1625
Fax: (905) 634-5332
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 4N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pascual Candia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Candia ( CPSO# 85512 )

Business Address:
2079 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1E2
Phone Number: (905) 634-1625

Business Address:
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 523-6611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PASCUAL REMBERTO CANDIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANDIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2006 to 07 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011